Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2068 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2068
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an identification card for certain retired peace
 officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1701.357(i), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (i) On request of an honorably [a] retired officer who holds
 a certificate of proficiency under this section, the head of the
 [a] state or local law enforcement agency from which the officer
 retired shall [may] issue to the retired officer identification
 that indicates that the officer honorably retired from the
 agency. An identification under this subsection must include a
 photograph of the retired officer.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *