Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2093 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Driver (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2093
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2009;
 May 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2093 By: Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the certification of a county jailer as a special
 officer for offenders with mental impairments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1701.404, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.404. CERTIFICATION OF OFFICERS FOR MENTAL HEALTH
 ASSIGNMENTS. (a) The commission by rule may establish minimum
 requirements for the training, testing, and certification of
 special officers for offenders with mental impairments.
 (b) The commission may certify a sheriff, sheriff's deputy,
 constable, [or] other peace officer, county jailer, or [a] justice
 of the peace[,] as a special officer for offenders with mental
 impairments if the person [officer]:
 (1) completes a training course in emergency first aid
 and lifesaving techniques approved by the commission;
 (2) completes a training course administered by the
 commission on mental health issues and offenders with mental
 impairments; and
 (3) passes an examination administered by the
 commission that is designed to test the person's [officer's]:
 (A) knowledge and recognition of the
 characteristics and symptoms of mental illness, mental
 retardation, and mental disabilities; and
 (B) knowledge of mental health crisis
 intervention strategies for people with mental impairments.
 (c) The commission may issue a professional achievement or
 proficiency certificate to an officer, county jailer, or justice of
 the peace who meets the requirements of Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2. (a) The Commission on Law Enforcement Officer
 Standards and Education may certify a county jailer as a special
 officer for offenders with mental impairments and may issue a
 certificate to the county jailer if the county jailer meets the
 requirements of Section 1701.404(b), Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, regardless of whether the county jailer completed the
 required training and passed the examination before, on, or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 (b) The Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and
 Education may issue a certificate under Section 1701.404(c),
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, to a justice of the peace
 who is certified as a special officer for offenders with mental
 impairments regardless of whether the justice of the peace was
 certified before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *