Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2104 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2104
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; April 23, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the statute of limitations for an action under the Beer
 Industry Fair Dealing Law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 102, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 102.82 to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.82.  STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS.  A person must bring
 suit on an action arising under this chapter not later than four
 years after the day the cause of action accrues.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before that
 date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *