Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2161 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Turner of Harris, Marquez (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2161
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 18, 2009, reported favorably, as amended, by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1By: By: Whitmire


 Amend H.B. 2161 (engrossed version) as follows:
 (1) In SECTION 2 of the bill, added Section 501.0165(c),
 Government Code (page 3, line 10), after the period, add "The
 memorandum of understanding must require the Department of State
 Health Services to electronically verify the birth record of an
 inmate whose name and any other personal information is provided by
 the department and to electronically report the recorded filing
 information to the Department of Public Safety to validate the
 identity of an inmate under this section.".
 (2) In SECTION 2 of the bill, added Section 501.0165(d),
 Government Code (page 3, line 12), strike "any" and substitute "the
 actual".
 (3) In SECTION 2 of the bill, in added Section 501.0165(d),
 Government Code (page 3, line 14), after the period add "The
 department may charge an inmate for the actual costs incurred under
 this section or the fees required by Section 521.421,
 Transportation Code.".
 (4) Insert the following appropriately numbered SECTIONS to
 the bill and renumber subsequent SECTIONS accordingly:
 SECTION ____. Section 521.001(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (1) and adding Subsections (1-a) and
 (7-a) to read as follows:
 (1) "Correctional facility" means:
 (A)  a place described by Section 1.07(a)(14),
 Penal Code; or
 (B)  a secure correctional facility or secure
 detention facility, as defined by Section 51.02, Family Code.
 (1-a) "Department" means the Department of Public
 Safety.
 (7-a)  "Parole facility" means a place described by
 Section 508.118 or 508.119, Government Code.
 SECTION ____. Section 521.101, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f-1) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  A personal identification certificate issued to a
 person whose residence or domicile is a correctional facility or a
 parole facility expires on the first birthday of the license holder
 occurring after the first anniversary of the date of issuance.
 SECTION ____. Section 521.271, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.271. LICENSE EXPIRATION. (a) Each original
 driver's license and provisional license expires as follows:
 (1) except as provided by Section 521.2711, a driver's
 license expires on the first birthday of the license holder
 occurring after the sixth anniversary of the date of the
 application;
 (2) a provisional license expires on the earlier of:
 (A) the 18th birthday of the license holder; or
 (B) the first birthday of the license holder
 occurring after the date of the application;
 (3) an instruction permit expires on the second
 birthday of the license holder occurring after the date of the
 application; [and]
 (4) an occupational license expires on the first
 anniversary of the court order granting the license; and
 (5)  unless an earlier date is otherwise provided, a
 driver's license issued to a person whose residence or domicile is a
 correctional facility or a parole facility expires on the first
 birthday of the license holder occurring after the first
 anniversary of the date of issuance.
 (b) Except as provided by Section 521.2711, a driver's
 license that is renewed expires on the earlier of:
 (1) the sixth anniversary of the expiration date
 before renewal; or
 (2)  for a renewal driver's license issued to a person
 whose residence or domicile is a correctional facility or a parole
 facility, the first birthday of the license holder occurring after
 the first anniversary of the date of issuance unless an earlier date
 is otherwise provided.
 SECTION ____. Section 521.421, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The fee for a personal identification certificate
 issued under Section 501.0165, Government Code, is $5.
 (a-2)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the
 department by rule shall establish the fee for a personal
 identification certificate or driver's license issued to a person
 whose residence or domicile is a correctional facility or a parole
 facility.
 SECTION ____. Section 522.051, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  A commercial driver's license issued to a person whose
 residence or domicile is a correctional facility or a parole
 facility expires on the first birthday of the license holder
 occurring after the first anniversary of the date of issuance. The
 department by rule shall establish the fee for a commercial
 driver's license issued to a person whose residence or domicile is a
 correctional facility or a parole facility.
 SECTION ____. Section 522.052, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  A renewal commercial driver's license issued to a person
 whose residence or domicile is a correctional facility or a parole
 facility expires on the first birthday of the license holder
 occurring after the first anniversary of the date of issuance.
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a personal identification certificate
 to present or former inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 501.015(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) When an inmate is discharged or is released on parole,
 mandatory supervision, or conditional pardon, the department
 [institutional division] shall provide the inmate with:
 (1) suitable civilian clothing;
 (2) money held in the inmate's trust account by the
 director; [and]
 (3) cash, in an amount and in the manner described by
 Subsection (b); and
 (4)  a personal identification certificate obtained
 under Section 501.0165, if available.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.0165 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.0165.  STATE-ISSUED IDENTIFICATION; NECESSARY
 DOCUMENTATION.  (a)  Before discharging an inmate or releasing an
 inmate on parole, mandatory supervision, or conditional pardon, the
 department shall:
 (1) determine whether the inmate has:
 (A)  a valid license issued under Chapter 521 or
 522, Transportation Code; or
 (B)  a valid personal identification certificate
 issued under Chapter 521, Transportation Code; and
 (2)  if the inmate does not have a valid license or
 certificate described by Subdivision (1), submit to the Department
 of Public Safety on behalf of the inmate a request for the issuance
 of a personal identification certificate under Chapter 521,
 Transportation Code.
 (b)  The department shall submit a request under Subsection
 (a)(2) as soon as is practicable to enable the department to provide
 the inmate with the personal identification certificate when the
 department discharges or releases the inmate.
 (c)  The department, the Department of Public Safety, and the
 bureau of vital statistics of the Department of State Health
 Services shall by rule adopt a memorandum of understanding that
 establishes their respective responsibilities with respect to the
 issuance of a personal identification certificate to an inmate,
 including responsibilities related to verification of the inmate's
 identity.
 (d)  The department shall reimburse the Department of Public
 Safety or the Department of State Health Services for any costs
 incurred by those agencies in performing responsibilities
 established under this section.
 (e) This section does not apply to an inmate who:
 (1) is not legally present in the United States; or
 (2)  was not a resident of this state before the person
 was placed in the custody of the department.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *