Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2163 Senate Amendments Printing / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 28, 2009      TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2163 by Turner, Sylvester (Relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.), As Passed 2nd House    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission to study and report on the feasibility of establishing separate reimbursement under the Medicaid program for pharmacy care management services. The report would be due to the legislature on September 1, 2010.    The bill would add Section 531.0731 to the Government Code, to require the Health and Human Services Commission to conduct a study on certain medications being provided through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.  The agency would report the results of the study by November 10, 2010. The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.   The Health and Human Services Commission indicates that the costs of the studies and reporting could be absorbed within existing resources at the agency. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 28, 2009





  TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2163 by Turner, Sylvester (Relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.), As Passed 2nd House  

TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2163 by Turner, Sylvester (Relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.), As Passed 2nd House

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2163 by Turner, Sylvester (Relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.), As Passed 2nd House

HB2163 by Turner, Sylvester (Relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.), As Passed 2nd House



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission to study and report on the feasibility of establishing separate reimbursement under the Medicaid program for pharmacy care management services. The report would be due to the legislature on September 1, 2010.    The bill would add Section 531.0731 to the Government Code, to require the Health and Human Services Commission to conduct a study on certain medications being provided through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.  The agency would report the results of the study by November 10, 2010. The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.   The Health and Human Services Commission indicates that the costs of the studies and reporting could be absorbed within existing resources at the agency.

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission to study and report on the feasibility of establishing separate reimbursement under the Medicaid program for pharmacy care management services. The report would be due to the legislature on September 1, 2010. 

 

The bill would add Section 531.0731 to the Government Code, to require the Health and Human Services Commission to conduct a study on certain medications being provided through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.  The agency would report the results of the study by November 10, 2010.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.  

The Health and Human Services Commission indicates that the costs of the studies and reporting could be absorbed within existing resources at the agency.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MB

 JOB, CL, MB