Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2163 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2163


 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications
 through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than
 16 years of age.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0731 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0731.  STUDY REGARDING THE PROVISION OF CERTAIN
 MEDICATION TO CHILDREN. (a) The commission shall conduct a study
 to determine the appropriateness and safety of providing
 antipsychotic or neuroleptic medication through the Medicaid
 vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age.
 (b)  The study conducted under Subsection (a) must consider
 the following factors relevant to the appropriateness and safety of
 providing the medications to children:
 (1)  the physical and psychological medical diagnosis
 of a child's condition;
 (2)  whether the United States Food and Drug
 Administration has approved a medication for use by a child of a
 certain age;
 (3)  whether a child has successfully taken a
 medication previously;
 (4)  access to quality medical care for a child
 receiving benefits under the program;
 (5)  the standard of care in the medical profession
 regarding the provision of such medications to a child; and
 (6)  any other factor the commission considers
 relevant.
 (c)  Not later than November 10, 2010, the executive
 commissioner shall submit a report containing the results of the
 study conducted under Subsection (a) to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the chairs of the Senate Committee on Health and Human Services
 and the House Committee on Public Health.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2163 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 4, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2163 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2163 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2163 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2163 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor