Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2168 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Chavez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2168
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of a sheriff's department civil service
 commission in certain counties regarding an appeal of a
 disciplinary action.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 158.035, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In rendering a final decision regarding a disciplinary
 action by the department, the commission may only sustain,
 overturn, or reduce the disciplinary action. The commission may
 not enhance a disciplinary action by the department.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a decision made by a sheriff's department civil service
 commission on or after the effective date of this Act. A decision
 made by a sheriff's department civil service commission before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
 decision was made, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *