Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2169 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2169


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of additional job incentive programs
 by the Texas Workforce Commission using the skills development
 fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 303.003, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The commission by rule may establish and develop
 additional job incentive programs that use the skills development
 fund to create incentives for public community and technical
 colleges in partnership with one or more employers, including
 prospective employers who commit to establishing a place of
 business in this state, to provide workforce training in an effort
 to create and retain employment opportunities in this state.  Under
 a program established under this subsection, the commission may
 commit money to a prospective employer described by this subsection
 contingent on the employer's establishment of a place of business
 in this state.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2169 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2169 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2169 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2169 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2169 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor