Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2181 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Berman (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 2181
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the computation of a person's age under the Election
 Code.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1.016, Election Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by the repeal of Section
 1.016, Election Code, by this Act does not affect the validity of a
 person's action taken before the effective date of this Act,
 including a person's registration to vote, if the person was
 qualified to take such action before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *