Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2191 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Veasey, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2191
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting contact between an employee of a facility
 that serves the elderly or disabled persons, whose criminal history
 has not been verified, and a patient or resident of the facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 250.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If a facility employs a person pending a criminal
 history check, the facility shall ensure that the person has no
 direct contact with a consumer until the facility obtains the
 person's criminal history record information and verifies the
 person's employability under Section 250.006.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the initial employment of a person by a facility regulated by
 Chapter 250, Health and Safety Code, on or after the effective date
 of this Act. The employment of a person by a facility regulated by
 Chapter 250, Health and Safety Code, before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect at the time the facility
 hired the employee, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *