Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2196 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R9671 YDB-F
 By: Truitt H.B. No. 2196


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a workgroup to study and make
 recommendations on the integration of health and behavioral health
 services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall establish a workgroup to recommend
 best practices in policy, training, and service delivery to promote
 the integration of health and behavioral health services in this
 state.
 (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall appoint members to serve on the
 workgroup. The workgroup must include:
 (1) at least one representative of the Department of
 State Health Services;
 (2) at least one representative of the Department of
 Aging and Disability Services;
 (3) at least one representative of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services;
 (4) at least one representative of the Health and
 Human Services Commission;
 (5) a representative of the Texas Department of
 Insurance;
 (6) a representative of a state organization that
 represents community mental health and mental retardation centers;
 (7) a representative of a state organization that
 represents federally qualified health centers;
 (8) a representative of a state organization that
 represents substance abuse providers;
 (9) at least one representative of state associations
 that represent medical and behavioral health professionals;
 (10) a representative of a mental health philanthropy
 that is an administrative unit of a public institution of higher
 education in this state and that agrees to provide administrative
 support to the workgroup; and
 (11) additional members who are recognized experts in
 integrated health care in the state, who have direct experience
 with the provision of integrated health care, or who represent the
 interests of consumers, communities, family members, advocates,
 business leaders, medical and behavioral health providers, and
 insurers.
 (c) The workgroup shall study and make recommendations on
 the integration of health and behavioral health services in this
 state. The workgroup may request any information it needs from
 state agencies, and the state agencies shall comply with the
 request.
 (d) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall:
 (1) not later than October 1, 2009, establish the
 workgroup as required under Subsection (a) of this section; and
 (2) not later than August 1, 2010, file with the
 appropriate committees of the senate and the house of
 representatives a report that describes the best practices for
 health and behavioral health integration, barriers to implementing
 the best practices in this state, and policy considerations for
 improving integrated service delivery to the citizens of this
 state.
 (e) This section expires and the workgroup created under
 this section is abolished on August 31, 2010.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.