Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2196 Conference Committee Report* / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 27, 2009      TO:Honorable David Dewhurst, Lieutenant Governor, Senate Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2196 by Truitt (Relating to the establishment of a workgroup to study and make recommendations on the integration of health and behavioral health services.), Conference Committee Report    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to establish a workgroup to recommend best practices in policy, training, and service delivery to promote integration of health and behavioral health services in the state.  The executive commissioner would be required to form the workgroup by October 1, 2009 and to submit a report by August 1, 2010 to the appropriate committees of the Senate and House of Representatives.  It is assumed that costs would be minimal and can be absorbed within existing resources. The bill would require the HHSC to hire a full-time director and administrative assistant to support the duties and functions of the new Interagency Task Force for Children with Special Needs. It would also require HHSC to provide administrative support related to quarterly meetings of the task force.  The costs associated with performing these duties are assumed to be within the agency's available resources.  It is assumed that the new staff would be accommodated within the existing full-time equivalent cap.  Costs for task force members to attend quarterly meetings and participate in planning and reporting are assumed to be minimal. The Task Force would be subject to sunset review and would be abolished September 1, 2015. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, PP, MB, SD    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 27, 2009





  TO:Honorable David Dewhurst, Lieutenant Governor, Senate Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2196 by Truitt (Relating to the establishment of a workgroup to study and make recommendations on the integration of health and behavioral health services.), Conference Committee Report  

TO: Honorable David Dewhurst, Lieutenant Governor, Senate Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2196 by Truitt (Relating to the establishment of a workgroup to study and make recommendations on the integration of health and behavioral health services.), Conference Committee Report

Honorable David Dewhurst, Lieutenant Governor, Senate Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

Honorable David Dewhurst, Lieutenant Governor, Senate Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2196 by Truitt (Relating to the establishment of a workgroup to study and make recommendations on the integration of health and behavioral health services.), Conference Committee Report

HB2196 by Truitt (Relating to the establishment of a workgroup to study and make recommendations on the integration of health and behavioral health services.), Conference Committee Report



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to establish a workgroup to recommend best practices in policy, training, and service delivery to promote integration of health and behavioral health services in the state.  The executive commissioner would be required to form the workgroup by October 1, 2009 and to submit a report by August 1, 2010 to the appropriate committees of the Senate and House of Representatives.  It is assumed that costs would be minimal and can be absorbed within existing resources. The bill would require the HHSC to hire a full-time director and administrative assistant to support the duties and functions of the new Interagency Task Force for Children with Special Needs. It would also require HHSC to provide administrative support related to quarterly meetings of the task force.  The costs associated with performing these duties are assumed to be within the agency's available resources.  It is assumed that the new staff would be accommodated within the existing full-time equivalent cap.  Costs for task force members to attend quarterly meetings and participate in planning and reporting are assumed to be minimal. The Task Force would be subject to sunset review and would be abolished September 1, 2015.

The bill would require the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to establish a workgroup to recommend best practices in policy, training, and service delivery to promote integration of health and behavioral health services in the state.  The executive commissioner would be required to form the workgroup by October 1, 2009 and to submit a report by August 1, 2010 to the appropriate committees of the Senate and House of Representatives.  It is assumed that costs would be minimal and can be absorbed within existing resources.

The bill would require the HHSC to hire a full-time director and administrative assistant to support the duties and functions of the new Interagency Task Force for Children with Special Needs. It would also require HHSC to provide administrative support related to quarterly meetings of the task force.  The costs associated with performing these duties are assumed to be within the agency's available resources.  It is assumed that the new staff would be accommodated within the existing full-time equivalent cap.  Costs for task force members to attend quarterly meetings and participate in planning and reporting are assumed to be minimal.

The Task Force would be subject to sunset review and would be abolished September 1, 2015.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, PP, MB, SD

 JOB, CL, PP, MB, SD