Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2219 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 2219
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 11, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public transportation advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 455.004(a), (b), and (c),
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) A public transportation advisory committee consisting
 of nine [11] members shall:
 (1) advise the commission on the needs and problems of
 the state's public transportation providers, including the methods
 for allocating state public transportation money;
 (2) comment on rules involving public transportation
 during development of the rules and before the commission finally
 adopts the rules unless an emergency requires immediate commission
 action;
 (3) advise the commission on the implementation of
 Chapter 461; [and]
 (4) perform any other duty determined by the
 commission; and
 (5) reflect the diversity of the state.
 (b) The members [commission shall appoint members of the
 advisory committee.     The membership] of the committee shall be
 appointed by the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker
 of the house of representatives, who shall each appoint [include]:
 (1) one member [four members] who represents
 [represent] a diverse cross-section of public transportation
 providers;
 (2) one member [three members] who represents
 [represent] a diverse cross-section of transportation users; and
 (3) one member [three members] who represents
 [represent] the general public[; and
 [(4)     one member with experience in the administration
 of health and human services programs].
 (c) A member serves at the pleasure of the officer who
 appointed the member [commission]. A member is not entitled to
 compensation for service on the committee but is entitled to
 reimbursement for reasonable expenses the member incurs in
 performing committee duties.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to the public
 transportation advisory committee does not affect the entitlement
 of a member serving on the committee immediately before the
 effective date of this Act to serve the remainder of the member's
 term. The first two members whose positions expire or become vacant
 may not be replaced.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *