Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2224 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Parker, Button (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2224
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2009;
 May 18, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2224 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the minimum standards for licensed child-care
 facilities and registered family homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Paisley's Law.
 SECTION 2. Section 42.042(e), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e) The department shall promulgate minimum standards that
 apply to licensed child-care facilities and to registered family
 homes covered by this chapter and that will:
 (1) promote the health, safety, and welfare of
 children attending a facility or registered family home;
 (2) promote safe, comfortable, and healthy physical
 facilities and registered family homes for children;
 (3) ensure adequate supervision of children by
 capable, qualified, and healthy personnel;
 (4) ensure adequate and healthy food service where
 food service is offered;
 (5) prohibit racial discrimination by child-care
 facilities and registered family homes;
 (6) require procedures for parental and guardian
 consultation in the formulation of children's educational and
 therapeutic programs; [and]
 (7) prevent the breakdown of foster care and adoptive
 placement; and
 (8)  ensure that a child-care facility or registered
 family home follows the written directives from a child's physician
 or other health care professional licensed under the Occupations
 Code when providing specialized medical assistance required by the
 child.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *