Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2263 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eissler (Senate Sponsor - Shapiro) H.B. No. 2263
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 11, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 11, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to extending the high school innovation grant initiative
 to middle and junior high schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 39.115, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.115. [HIGH SCHOOL] INNOVATION GRANT INITIATIVE FOR
 MIDDLE, JUNIOR HIGH, AND HIGH SCHOOL CAMPUSES.
 SECTION 2. Sections 39.115(a), (b), and (d), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) From funds appropriated for that purpose, the
 commissioner may establish a grant program under which grants are
 awarded to middle, junior high, and high school [secondary]
 campuses and school districts to support:
 (1) the implementation of innovative [high school]
 improvement programs that are based on the best available research
 regarding middle, junior high, or high school reform, dropout
 prevention, and preparing students for postsecondary coursework or
 employment;
 (2) enhancing education practices that have been
 demonstrated by significant evidence of effectiveness; and
 (3) the alignment of grants and programs to the
 strategic plan adopted under Section 39.357.
 (b) Before awarding a grant under this section, the
 commissioner may require a campus or school district to:
 (1) obtain local matching funds; or
 (2) meet other conditions, including developing a
 personal graduation plan under Section 28.0212 for each student
 enrolled at the campus or in a district middle, junior high, or high
 school.
 (d) The commissioner may use funds appropriated under this
 section to support technical assistance services for school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools to implement an [a
 high school] improvement program under this section.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *