Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2267 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hodge, Dutton H.B. No. 2267
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2267By: Whitmire By: Whitmire
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the joint or separate prosecution in capital felony
 cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 36.09, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 36.09. SEVERANCE ON SEPARATE INDICTMENTS. (a) Two or
 more defendants who are jointly or separately indicted or
 complained against for the same offense or any offense growing out
 of the same transaction may be, in the discretion of the court,
 tried jointly or separately as to one or more defendants; provided
 that in any event either defendant may testify for the other or on
 behalf of the state; and provided further, that in cases in which,
 upon timely motion to sever, and evidence introduced thereon, it is
 made known to the court that there is a previous admissible
 conviction against one defendant or that a joint trial would be
 prejudicial to any defendant, the court shall order a severance as
 to the defendant whose joint trial would prejudice the other
 defendant or defendants.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the court may not join
 two or more defendants in the same criminal trial if any defendant
 to be tried is indicted or complained against for a capital felony
 for which the state seeks the death penalty, and the court shall
 order a severance as to any two or more defendants who are jointly
 indicted or complained against for a capital felony if the state
 seeks the death penalty for any one of those defendants.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a trial commenced in a criminal case on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A trial commenced before the effective date of
 this Act is covered by the law in effect when the trial commenced,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *