Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2275 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2275
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 1, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 International Relations and Trade; May 8, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2275 By: Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a task force to develop uniform standards for
 subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties near the
 international border and in economically distressed counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the current law
 regarding the regulation of subdivisions in the unincorporated
 areas of counties near the international border and in economically
 distressed counties should be reviewed to ensure that statutory
 provisions are consistent and clearly achieve the goals of
 promoting uniform subdivision standards in those counties and
 enhancing the quality of living for the residents of those
 subdivisions.
 SECTION 2. (a) The Task Force on Uniform County Subdivision
 Regulation is composed of 23 members appointed as follows:
 (1) six members who are county officials or employees
 responsible for regulating subdivisions under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 232, Local Government Code, appointed by the executive
 administrator of the Texas Water Development Board from each of the
 following counties:
 (A) El Paso;
 (B) Webb;
 (C) Starr;
 (D) Hidalgo;
 (E) Cameron; and
 (F) Nueces;
 (2) six members who are members of organizations that
 represent the interests of colonia residents, appointed by the
 executive director of the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs;
 (3) three members who are county officials or
 employees responsible for regulating subdivisions under Subchapter
 C, Chapter 232, Local Government Code, appointed by the executive
 administrator of the Texas Water Development Board;
 (4) one member who is a representative of the Texas
 Water Development Board and is appointed by the executive
 administrator of the board;
 (5) one member who has legal expertise in subdivision
 regulation appointed by the attorney general to represent the
 interests of the state;
 (6) one member who has expertise in matters affecting
 colonias appointed by the secretary of state to represent the
 interests of the state;
 (7) three members who are appointed by the president
 of the Texas Association of Builders to represent the interests of
 builders and land developers;
 (8) one member who is a representative of the Texas
 Conference of Urban Counties appointed by the executive director of
 that organization; and
 (9) one member who is a representative of the County
 Judges and Commissioners Association of Texas appointed by the
 president of that association.
 (b) The members of the Task Force on Uniform County
 Subdivision Regulation appointed under Subsection (a) of this
 section shall elect a presiding officer, a secretary, and any other
 officers the board considers necessary.
 (c) Appointments to the Task Force on Uniform County
 Subdivision Regulation shall be made without regard to race, color,
 disability, sex, religion, age, or national origin of the
 appointees.
 (d) A member of the task force who is a state or county
 employee is not entitled to additional compensation for serving on
 the task force, but is entitled to reimbursement for the member's
 actual and necessary expenses in attending meetings of the task
 force and performing other official duties authorized by the
 presiding officer if the reimbursement is otherwise available to
 the member as a state or county employee.
 (e) The attorney general shall provide administrative
 support to the task force, including necessary staff and meeting
 facilities.
 (f) The task force, through the attorney general, may accept
 gifts and grants from individuals, private or public organizations,
 or federal or local funds to support the task force.
 (g) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 SECTION 3. The Task Force on Uniform County Subdivision
 Regulation shall:
 (1) research and identify the conflicts and
 deficiencies in current law regarding the regulation of the
 development of subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties
 near the international border and in economically distressed
 counties; and
 (2) develop recommendations and draft a proposal for
 legislation to create uniform standards for the regulation of the
 development of subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties
 near the international border and in economically distressed
 counties.
 SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2010, the Task Force
 on Uniform County Subdivision Regulation shall submit its findings,
 recommendations, and proposal for legislation to the standing
 committees of the senate and house of representatives having
 primary jurisdiction over border regions or county affairs.
 SECTION 5. The Task Force on Uniform County Subdivision
 Regulation is abolished and this Act expires on September 2, 2011.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *