Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2275 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2275


 AN ACT
 relating to creating a task force to develop uniform standards for
 subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties near the
 international border and in economically distressed counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the current law
 regarding the regulation of subdivisions in the unincorporated
 areas of counties near the international border and in economically
 distressed counties should be reviewed to ensure that statutory
 provisions are consistent and clearly achieve the goals of
 promoting uniform subdivision standards in those counties and
 enhancing the quality of living for the residents of those
 subdivisions.
 SECTION 2. (a) The Task Force on Uniform County Subdivision
 Regulation is composed of 23 members as follows:
 (1) six members who are county officials or employees
 responsible for regulating subdivisions under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 232, Local Government Code, appointed by the executive
 administrator of the Texas Water Development Board from each of the
 following counties:
 (A) El Paso;
 (B) Webb;
 (C) Starr;
 (D) Hidalgo;
 (E) Cameron; and
 (F) Nueces;
 (2) six members who are members of organizations that
 represent the interests of colonia residents, appointed by the
 executive director of the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs;
 (3) three members who are county officials or
 employees responsible for regulating subdivisions under Subchapter
 C, Chapter 232, Local Government Code, appointed by the executive
 administrator of the Texas Water Development Board;
 (4) one member who is a representative of the Texas
 Water Development Board and is appointed by the executive
 administrator of the board;
 (5) one member who has legal expertise in subdivision
 regulation appointed by the attorney general to represent the
 interests of the state;
 (6) the secretary of state or a designee of the
 secretary of state who has expertise in matters affecting colonias;
 (7) three members who are appointed by the president
 of the Texas Association of Builders to represent the interests of
 builders and land developers;
 (8) one member who is a representative of the Texas
 Conference of Urban Counties appointed by the executive director of
 that organization; and
 (9) one member who is a representative of the County
 Judges and Commissioners Association of Texas appointed by the
 president of that association.
 (b) The members of the Task Force on Uniform County
 Subdivision Regulation shall elect a presiding officer, a
 secretary, and any other officers the members consider necessary.
 (c) Appointments to the Task Force on Uniform County
 Subdivision Regulation shall be made without regard to race, color,
 disability, sex, religion, age, or national origin of the
 appointees.
 (d) A member of the task force who is a state or county
 employee is not entitled to additional compensation for serving on
 the task force, but is entitled to reimbursement for the member's
 actual and necessary expenses in attending meetings of the task
 force and performing other official duties authorized by the
 presiding officer if the reimbursement is otherwise available to
 the member as a state or county employee. A member of the task force
 may not be paid compensation or reimbursement for travel or other
 expenses from state funds unless the legislature makes a specific
 appropriation for that purpose.
 (e) The Texas Water Development Board shall provide
 administrative support to the task force, including necessary staff
 and meeting facilities. The Texas Water Development Board may
 require the task force to conduct meetings at a location that is
 geographically convenient to a majority of the members of the task
 force or in various geographic regions of the state.
 (f) The task force, through the Texas Water Development
 Board, may accept gifts and grants from individuals, private or
 public organizations, or federal or local funds to support the task
 force.
 (g) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 SECTION 3. The Task Force on Uniform County Subdivision
 Regulation shall:
 (1) research and identify the conflicts and
 deficiencies in current law regarding the regulation of the
 development of subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties
 near the international border and in economically distressed
 counties; and
 (2) develop recommendations and draft a proposal for
 legislation to create uniform standards for the regulation of the
 development of subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties
 near the international border and in economically distressed
 counties.
 SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2010, the Task Force
 on Uniform County Subdivision Regulation shall submit its findings,
 recommendations, and proposal for legislation to the standing
 committees of the senate and house of representatives having
 primary jurisdiction over border regions or county affairs.
 SECTION 5. The Task Force on Uniform County Subdivision
 Regulation is abolished and this Act expires on September 2, 2011.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2275 was passed by the House on March
 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2275 on May 23, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2275 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 118,
 Nays 27, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2275 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2275 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor