Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2283 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Truitt (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2283
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2283 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing state employee participation in the
 TexaSaver program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 609.006(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) A deferred compensation plan must conform to federal law
 to provide that deferred amounts and investment income are not
 includable, for federal income tax purposes, in the gross income of
 a participating employee until distributed to the employee, subject
 to the employee's option to designate all or a portion of deferred
 amounts as Roth contributions under Section 609.5021, the federal
 income tax treatment of which is governed by Section 402A, Internal
 Revenue Code of 1986.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 609, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 609.5021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 609.5021.  ROTH CONTRIBUTION PROGRAMS. The board of
 trustees may:
 (1)  establish a qualified Roth contribution program in
 accordance with Section 402A, Internal Revenue Code of 1986, under
 which an employee may designate all or a portion of the employee's
 contribution under a 401(k) plan as a Roth contribution at the time
 the contribution is made; and
 (2)  if authorized by federal law, establish a program
 in accordance with the applicable federal law under which an
 employee may designate all or a portion of the employee's
 contribution under a 457 plan as a Roth contribution at the time the
 contribution is made.
 SECTION 3. Section 609.5025(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d) At any time, an employee participating in a 401(k) plan
 under this section may, in accordance with rules adopted by the
 board of trustees, elect to end participation in the 401(k) plan, to
 contribute to a different investment product, [or] to contribute a
 different amount to the plan, or to designate all or a portion of
 the employee's contribution as a Roth contribution subject to the
 availability of a Roth contribution program under Section 609.5021.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 609, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 609.5026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 609.5026.  STATE MATCHING CONTRIBUTIONS. Subject to a
 separate legislative appropriation for that purpose, the Employees
 Retirement System of Texas may make matching contributions to a
 401(k) plan on behalf of employees participating in the plan solely
 from, and in an amount specified by, the appropriation.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *