By: Davis of Dallas (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2307 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009; May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to coverage under a meet and confer agreement for certain municipal firefighters and police officers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 147.002, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 147.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: (1) "Firefighter" means a firefighter employed by the municipality who is covered by the municipality's fire pension plan and is classified by the municipality as nonexempt [exempt]. The term does not include a firefighter with a rank that is above that of battalion chief or section chief. (2) "Firefighter employee group" means an organization: (A) in which, on or before September 1, 2007, firefighters of the municipality have participated and paid dues via automatic payroll deduction [for at least one year]; and (B) that exists for the purpose, in whole or in part, of dealing with the municipality concerning grievances, labor disputes, wages, rates of pay, hours of employment, or conditions of employment affecting firefighters. (3) "Police officer" means a sworn police officer employed by the municipality who is covered by the municipality's police pension plan and is classified by the municipality as nonexempt [exempt]. The term does not include a police officer with a rank above that of captain, a civilian, or a municipal marshal. (4) "Police officer employee group" means an organization: (A) in which, on or before September 1, 2007, at least three percent of the police officers of the municipality have participated and paid dues via automatic payroll deduction [for at least one year]; and (B) that exists for the purpose, in whole or in part, of dealing with the municipality concerning grievances, labor disputes, wages, rates of pay, hours of employment, or conditions of employment affecting police officers. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *