Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2328 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2328
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2328 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulating employment at or by certain facilities
 serving the elderly or persons with disabilities and to certain
 acts committed against those individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 250.006(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person for whom the facility is entitled to obtain
 criminal history record information may not be employed in a
 facility if the person has been convicted of an offense listed in
 this subsection:
 (1) an offense under Chapter 19, Penal Code (criminal
 homicide);
 (2) an offense under Chapter 20, Penal Code
 (kidnapping and unlawful restraint);
 (3) an offense under Section 21.02, Penal Code
 (continuous sexual abuse of young child or children), or Section
 21.11, Penal Code (indecency with a child);
 (4) an offense under Section 22.011, Penal Code
 (sexual assault);
 (5) an offense under Section 22.02, Penal Code
 (aggravated assault);
 (6) an offense under Section 22.04, Penal Code (injury
 to a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual);
 (7) an offense under Section 22.041, Penal Code
 (abandoning or endangering child);
 (8) an offense under Section 22.08, Penal Code (aiding
 suicide);
 (9) an offense under Section 25.031, Penal Code
 (agreement to abduct from custody);
 (10) an offense under Section 25.08, Penal Code (sale
 or purchase of a child);
 (11) an offense under Section 28.02, Penal Code
 (arson);
 (12) an offense under Section 29.02, Penal Code
 (robbery);
 (13) an offense under Section 29.03, Penal Code
 (aggravated robbery);
 (14) an offense under Section 21.08, Penal Code
 (indecent exposure);
 (15) an offense under Section 21.12, Penal Code
 (improper relationship between educator and student);
 (16) an offense under Section 21.15, Penal Code
 (improper photography or visual recording);
 (17) an offense under Section 22.05, Penal Code
 (deadly conduct);
 (18) an offense under Section 22.021, Penal Code
 (aggravated sexual assault);
 (19) an offense under Section 22.07, Penal Code
 (terroristic threat);
 (20) an offense under Section 33.021, Penal Code
 (online solicitation of a minor);
 (21) an offense under Section 34.02, Penal Code (money
 laundering);
 (22) an offense under Section 35A.02, Penal Code
 (Medicaid fraud);
 (23) an offense under Section 36.06, Penal Code
 (obstruction or retaliation);
 (24) an offense under Section 42.09, Penal Code
 (cruelty to animals); or
 (25) [(24)] a conviction under the laws of another
 state, federal law, or the Uniform Code of Military Justice for an
 offense containing elements that are substantially similar to the
 elements of an offense listed by this subsection.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Chapter 253, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 253. CERTAIN EMPLOYEE MISCONDUCT; REGISTRY
 SECTION 3. Section 253.001(5), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (5) "Reportable conduct" includes:
 (A) abuse or neglect that causes or may cause
 death or harm to a resident or consumer of a facility;
 (B) sexual abuse of a resident or consumer of a
 facility;
 (C) financial exploitation of a resident or
 consumer of a facility in an amount of $25 or more; [and]
 (D) emotional, verbal, or psychological abuse
 that causes harm to a resident or consumer of a facility; and
 (E)  solicitation of a gift from a resident or
 consumer of a facility.
 SECTION 4. Section 32.21, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c) Except as provided by [in] Subsections (d), [and] (e),
 and (e-1), an offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 (e-1)  An offense under this section is increased to the next
 higher category of offense if it is shown on the trial of the
 offense that the offense was committed against an elderly
 individual as defined by Section 22.04.
 SECTION 5. Section 32.31(d), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (d) An offense under this section is a state jail felony,
 except that the offense is a felony of the third degree if it is
 shown on the trial of the offense that the offense was committed
 against an elderly individual as defined by Section 22.04.
 SECTION 6. Section 32.51, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  An offense described for purposes of punishment by
 Subsections (c)(1)-(3) is increased to the next higher category of
 offense if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the offense
 was committed against an elderly individual as defined by Section
 22.04.
 SECTION 7. The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Sections 32.21, 32.31, and 32.51, Penal Code, applies only to an
 offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose. For the purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *