Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2333 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 2333
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the lease of certain oil, gas, or mineral land by a
 municipality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 253.005(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A municipality may [not] lease under this section a
 street, alley, or public square in the municipality if the lease
 prohibits the lessee from using the surface of the land for
 drilling, production, or other operations. In this subsection,
 "public square" does not include a dedicated public park.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *