Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2347 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thibaut, Guillen H.B. No. 2347
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2347By: Duncan By: Duncan
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 25, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tuition and laboratory fee exemptions at public
 institutions of higher education for certain peace officers
 enrolled in criminal justice or law enforcement management-related
 course work.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.208, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.208. FIREFIGHTERS AND PEACE OFFICERS [FIREMEN]
 ENROLLED IN CERTAIN [FIRE SCIENCE] COURSES. (a) The governing
 board of an institution of higher education [boards of the state
 institutions of collegiate rank supported in whole or in part by
 public funds] shall exempt from the payment of tuition and
 laboratory fees a student [any person] who is employed as a
 firefighter [fireman] by a [any] political subdivision of this
 [the] state and who enrolls in a course or courses offered as part
 of a fire science curriculum.
 (b)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall exempt from the payment of tuition and laboratory
 fees charged by the institution for a criminal justice or law
 enforcement course or courses an undergraduate student who:
 (1)  is employed as a peace officer by this state or by
 a political subdivision of this state;
 (2)  is enrolled in a criminal justice or law
 enforcement-related degree program at the institution;
 (3)  is making satisfactory academic progress toward
 the student's degree as determined by the institution; and
 (4)  applies for the exemption at least one week before
 the last date of the institution's regular registration period for
 the applicable semester or other term.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a student may not
 receive an exemption under that subsection for any course if the
 student has previously attempted a number of semester credit hours
 for courses taken at any institution of higher education while
 classified as a resident student for tuition purposes in excess of
 the maximum number of those hours specified by Section 61.0595(a)
 as eligible for funding under the formulas established under
 Section 61.059.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the governing board of
 an institution of higher education may not provide exemptions under
 that subsection to students enrolled in a specific class in a number
 that exceeds 20 percent of the maximum student enrollment
 designated by the institution for that class.
 (e) An [The] exemption provided under this section does not
 apply to deposits that [which] may be required in the nature of
 security for the return or proper care of property loaned for the
 use of students.
 (f)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt:
 (1)  rules governing the granting or denial of an
 exemption under this section, including rules relating to the
 determination of a student's eligibility for an exemption; and
 (2)  a uniform listing of degree programs covered by
 the exemption under this section.
 (g)  If the legislature does not specifically appropriate
 funds to an institution of higher education in an amount sufficient
 to pay the institution's costs in complying with this section for a
 semester, the governing board of the institution of higher
 education shall report to the Senate Finance Committee and the
 House Appropriations Committee the cost to the institution of
 complying with this section for that semester.
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 54.208, Education Code, apply beginning with tuition and laboratory
 fees charged for the 2011 fall semester. Tuition and laboratory
 fees charged for an academic period before the 2011 fall semester
 are covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2011.
 * * * * *