By: Hughes (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2353 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2009; April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the limitations period for certain disciplinary actions against title insurance companies. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 2551.001(c), Insurance Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as follows: (c) To the extent applicable, the following provisions of this code apply to a title insurance company: (1) Articles 1.09-1 and 21.47; (2) Subsection (b), Article 1.04D; (3) Chapters 33, 82, 83, 84, 86, 102, 261, 281, 401, 402, 493, 494, 541, 547, 555, 701, 801, 802, 824, 828, 1805, and 2204; (4) Chapter 31, other than Section 31.005; (5) Chapter 32, other than Section 32.022(b); (6) Chapter 36, other than Sections 36.003, 36.004, and 36.101-36.106; (7) Subchapter A, Chapter 38; (8) Subchapters A-G, Chapter 101; (9) Chapter 982, other than Sections 982.003, 982.051, 982.101, 982.105, 982.106(b), 982.109, and 982.113; and (10) Sections 37.052, 39.001, 39.002, 81.001, 81.002, 81.004, 201.004, 201.005, 201.051, 201.055, 403.001, 403.051, 403.101, 521.002-521.004, 805.021, 822.001, 822.051, 822.052(1), (2), and (3), 822.053, 822.057, except Subsection (a)(4), 822.058, 822.059, 822.060, 822.155, 822.157, 822.158, except Subsection (a)(5), 841.004, 841.251, 841.252(a)-(c), and 4001.103. SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies only to an action that the department or commissioner begins under Section 81.001, Insurance Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. (b) An action that the department or commissioner begins under Section 81.001, Insurance Code, before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *