Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB238 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 22, 2009      TO: Honorable Rene Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB238 by Rodriguez (Relating to an exemption from the sales tax for certain renewable energy devices.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB238, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,598,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 22, 2009





  TO: Honorable Rene Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB238 by Rodriguez (Relating to an exemption from the sales tax for certain renewable energy devices.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Rene Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB238 by Rodriguez (Relating to an exemption from the sales tax for certain renewable energy devices.), As Introduced

 Honorable Rene Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means 

 Honorable Rene Oliveira, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB238 by Rodriguez (Relating to an exemption from the sales tax for certain renewable energy devices.), As Introduced

HB238 by Rodriguez (Relating to an exemption from the sales tax for certain renewable energy devices.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB238, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,598,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB238, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,598,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($2,549,000)   2011 ($3,049,000)   2012 ($3,343,000)   2013 ($3,666,000)   2014 ($4,020,000)    


2010 ($2,549,000)
2011 ($3,049,000)
2012 ($3,343,000)
2013 ($3,666,000)
2014 ($4,020,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromTransit Authorities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCounties   2010 ($2,549,000) ($431,000) ($147,000) ($61,000)   2011 ($3,049,000) ($567,000) ($193,000) ($80,000)   2012 ($3,343,000) ($622,000) ($212,000) ($88,000)   2013 ($3,666,000) ($682,000) ($232,000) ($96,000)   2014 ($4,020,000) ($748,000) ($255,000) ($106,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromTransit Authorities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCounties   2010 ($2,549,000) ($431,000) ($147,000) ($61,000)   2011 ($3,049,000) ($567,000) ($193,000) ($80,000)   2012 ($3,343,000) ($622,000) ($212,000) ($88,000)   2013 ($3,666,000) ($682,000) ($232,000) ($96,000)   2014 ($4,020,000) ($748,000) ($255,000) ($106,000)  


2010 ($2,549,000) ($431,000) ($147,000) ($61,000)
2011 ($3,049,000) ($567,000) ($193,000) ($80,000)
2012 ($3,343,000) ($622,000) ($212,000) ($88,000)
2013 ($3,666,000) ($682,000) ($232,000) ($96,000)
2014 ($4,020,000) ($748,000) ($255,000) ($106,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 151 of the Tax Code to create a sales tax exemption for "renewable energy devices" installed on a retail customer's side of the meter. Renewable energy devices would mean a device that exclusively uses one or more renewable energy technologies to generate electricity. "Renewable energy technologies" would have the meaning assigned by Section 39.904 of the Utilities Code and would include those that rely on energy derived directly from the sun, on wind, geothermal, hydroelectric, wave, or tidal energy, or on biomass or bio mass-based waste products, including landfill gas. "Retail customer" would mean the separately metered end-use customer who purchases and ultimately consumes electricity.  Currently, renewable energy devices purchased to generate electricity for sale are exempt from the state sales and use tax as manufacturing equipment.    The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.  The exemption would expire August 31, 2017.

The bill would amend Chapter 151 of the Tax Code to create a sales tax exemption for "renewable energy devices" installed on a retail customer's side of the meter.

Renewable energy devices would mean a device that exclusively uses one or more renewable energy technologies to generate electricity. "Renewable energy technologies" would have the meaning assigned by Section 39.904 of the Utilities Code and would include those that rely on energy derived directly from the sun, on wind, geothermal, hydroelectric, wave, or tidal energy, or on biomass or bio mass-based waste products, including landfill gas. "Retail customer" would mean the separately metered end-use customer who purchases and ultimately consumes electricity.  Currently, renewable energy devices purchased to generate electricity for sale are exempt from the state sales and use tax as manufacturing equipment.   





Methodology

Data on the sale of renewable energy devices were gathered from several sources, including the Energy Information Administration.  Sales were adjusted to reflect Texas sales; multiplied by the state sales tax rate; adjusted for the effective date of September 1, 2009; and extrapolated through 2014. 

Local Government Impact

There would be a proportional loss of sales tax revenue to units of local government.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: JOB, MN, SD, KK

 JOB, MN, SD, KK