Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB241 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R2476 JSA-D
 By: Alonzo H.B. No. 241


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report concerning predicted faculty
 retirement at general academic teaching institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.4021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4021.  STUDY AND REPORT OF PREDICTED FACULTY
 RETIREMENT.  (a) In this section, "general academic teaching
 institution," "governing board," and "university system" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  To address the predicted retirement of a growing portion
 of university faculty in the coming years and the potential
 problems associated with that retirement, each general academic
 teaching institution shall conduct a study relating to faculty
 member retirements that may occur through the end of the 2025
 academic year, including projections of the number and proportion
 of faculty members expected to retire during that period, the first
 academic year in which increasing retirements are expected to
 result in faculty shortages, and methods that the institution could
 reasonably implement to address those retirement issues through
 recruitment of new faculty members or other means. The governing
 board of an institution may appoint a committee to conduct the
 study. A university system may carry out the requirements
 prescribed by this subsection for the system's component
 institutions or may direct one or more component institutions to
 conduct the study for the system.
 (c)  Each general academic teaching institution or
 university system, as applicable, shall prepare a report based on
 the study required by Subsection (b). The institution or system
 shall submit the report to the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board not later than August 1, 2010.  The coordinating board shall
 compile the reports submitted to the board under this subsection
 and, not later than December 1, 2010, shall submit the compilation
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative
 standing committee or subcommittee with primary jurisdiction over
 higher education.
 (d) This section expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.