Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2424 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Morrison, Deshotel, Hamilton H.B. No. 2424
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 13, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 13, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exempting Lamar State College--Orange and Lamar State
 College--Port Arthur from certain requirements relating to student
 admissions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 51.805, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  This section does not apply to Lamar State
 College--Orange or Lamar State College--Port Arthur as long as
 those institutions operate as two-year lower-division institutions
 of higher education.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *