H.B. No. 2425 AN ACT relating to engineering recruitment programs at public or private institutions of higher education and to certain degree programs at public junior colleges. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 61.791(a), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The board shall establish and administer, using funds appropriated for that purpose, a one-week summer program to take place on the campus of each general academic teaching institution or private or independent institution of higher education that offers an engineering degree program. The summer program must be designed for middle and high school students and to expose those students to math, science, and engineering concepts that a student in an engineering degree program may encounter. SECTION 2. Sections 61.792(a) and (b), Education Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) The board shall establish and administer, using funds appropriated for that purpose, scholarships for students pursuing a degree in engineering at a general academic teaching institution or a private or independent institution of higher education. (b) To qualify for a scholarship under this section, a student must: (1) have graduated with a grade point average in the top 20 percent of the student's high school graduating class; (2) have graduated from high school with a grade point average of at least 3.5 on a four-point scale or the equivalent in mathematics and science courses offered under the recommended or advanced high school program under Section 28.025(a); and (3) maintain an overall grade point average of at least 3.0 on a four-point scale at the general academic teaching institution or the private or independent institution of higher education in which the student is enrolled. SECTION 3. Section 130.0012, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (k) to read as follows: (k) The board shall conduct a study relating to the success of baccalaureate degree programs offered under this section and to the feasibility of expanding the offering of baccalaureate degrees by public junior colleges. The study must consider the economic viability of expanding the degree programs, the workforce needs served by the degree programs for various areas of the state, current and potential university course offerings, and other methods for making baccalaureate degrees available, such as distance education programs and multi-institutional teaching centers. Not later than November 15, 2010, the board shall report the results of the study to each standing committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over higher education. This subsection expires January 1, 2011. SECTION 4. (a) Sections 61.791 and 61.792, Education Code, as amended by this Act, apply beginning with the 2009-2010 academic year. (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall adopt rules for the administration of Sections 61.791 and 61.792, Education Code, as amended by this Act, as soon as practicable after this Act takes effect. For that purpose, the coordinating board may adopt the rules in the manner provided by law for emergency rules. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2425 was passed by the House on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2425 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2425 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor