Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2433 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smith of Harris H.B. No. 2433
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2433By: Wentworth By: Wentworth
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 1, 2009;
 April 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; April 17, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of certain freight rail districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 171.053, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.053. INTERMUNICIPAL COMMUTER RAIL DISTRICT
 POWERS. The governing bodies of the county or counties and of the
 most populous municipality in the most populous county may provide
 that the district may exercise the powers of an intermunicipal
 commuter rail district created under Article 6550c-1, Revised
 Statutes, including the powers related to a commuter rail facility
 and other types of passenger rail services, including intercity
 rail services, by specifying in the concurrent order or ordinance
 creating the district that those powers may be exercised by the
 district.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 171, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 171.256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.256.  LOCAL GOVERNMENT FINANCING.  (a)  Section
 8(d), Article 6550c-1, Revised Statutes, relating to the limit on
 payments made by a local government does not apply to a district to
 which Section 171.053 applies.
 (b)  A district to which Section 171.053 applies may use
 money paid to the district by a local government outside the
 territory of the local government if the money is used for a public
 purpose of the local government.
 (c)  A district to which Section 171.053 applies may pledge
 money paid to the district by a local government to secure the
 payment of a district debt.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *