Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2435 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2435
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location of an arbitration trial.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 151.010, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.010. RESTRICTIONS. Unless otherwise ordered by
 the referring judge, a [A] trial under this chapter may not be held
 in a public courtroom, and a public employee may not be involved in
 the trial during regular working hours.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a trial commenced on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 trial commenced before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law as it existed immediately before that date, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *