Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2462 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2462
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 23, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2462 By: Shapiro


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county to clarify the existence of a
 public interest in certain roads.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 258.007, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 258.007. APPLICATION [EXPIRATION] OF CHAPTER. This
 chapter applies only to a county that initiates or completes
 compliance with the provisions of this chapter before [expires]
 September 1, 2011 [2009].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *