Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2515 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smith of Tarrant (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 2515
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 3,
 Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2515 By: Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain requirements applicable to certain public
 contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2253.021(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) A governmental entity that makes a public work contract
 with a prime contractor shall require the contractor, before
 beginning the work, to execute to the governmental entity:
 (1) a performance bond if the contract is in excess of
 $100,000; and
 (2) a payment bond if:
 (A) the contract is in excess of $25,000, and the
 governmental entity is not a municipality or a joint board created
 under Subchapter D, Chapter 22, Transportation Code; or
 (B)  the contract is in excess of $50,000, and the
 governmental entity is a municipality or a joint board created
 under Subchapter D, Chapter 22, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2. Section 53.231, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 53.231. LIEN. (a) A person who furnishes material
 or labor to a contractor under a prime contract with a governmental
 entity other than a municipality or a joint board created under
 Subchapter D, Chapter 22, Transportation Code, that does not exceed
 $25,000 and that is for public improvements in this state and who
 gives notice required by this subchapter has a lien on the money,
 bonds, or warrants due the contractor for the improvements.
 (b)  A person who furnishes material or labor to a contractor
 under a prime contract with a municipality or a joint board created
 under Subchapter D, Chapter 22, Transportation Code, that does not
 exceed $50,000 and that is for public improvements in this state and
 who gives notice required by this subchapter has a lien on the
 money, bonds, or warrants due the contractor for the improvements.
 SECTION 3. Section 53.234, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 53.234. TIME FOR NOTICE. The lien claimant must give
 notice [before any payment is made to the contractor and] not later
 than the 15th day of the second month following the month in which
 the labor was performed or the material furnished.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 2253.021(a), Government Code, apply only to a contract entered into
 on or after the effective date of this Act. A contract entered into
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the contract was entered into, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *