Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2521 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pickett, Solomons (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2521
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2521 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a preference in state purchasing for certain
 media-related services offered by businesses based in Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2155.444, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (f)  The comptroller and each state agency conducting an
 advertising campaign that involves the creation or production of a
 commercial shall give preference to a commercial production company
 and advertising agency located in this state if:
 (1)  the services meet state requirements regarding the
 service to be performed and regarding expected quality; and
 (2)  the cost of the service does not exceed the cost of
 other similar services of similar expected quality that are offered
 by a bidder that is not entitled to a preference under this
 subsection.
 (g)  For purposes of Subsection (f), "commercial production
 company" means a corporation, limited liability company,
 partnership, or other private entity that includes as one of its
 purposes the production of one or more television, film, radio, or
 other media-related commercials.
 (h)  The Music, Film, Television, and Multimedia Office
 within the office of the governor has exclusive rulemaking
 authority for purposes of:
 (1)  determining whether an advertising campaign is
 subject to the requirements of this section;
 (2)  establishing a bid process for purposes of the
 services described by Subsection (f); and
 (3)  establishing criteria to determine whether a
 commercial production company or advertising agency is located in
 this state for the purposes of this section.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract for which a state agency first advertises or otherwise
 solicits bids, proposals, offers, or qualifications on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A contract for which a state agency
 first advertised or otherwise solicited bids, proposals, offers, or
 qualifications before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect when the first advertisement or solicitation was
 given, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *