Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2536 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2536
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2009;
 May 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the floodplain management account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 16.3161, Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 16.3161. FLOODPLAIN MANAGEMENT FUND [ACCOUNT].
 (a) The floodplain management fund [account] is a special fund in
 the state treasury outside the general revenue fund. The fund is
 composed of:
 (1) money deposited to the credit of the fund
 [account] under Section 251.004, Insurance Code;
 (2) money directly appropriated to the board; [and]
 (3) money from gifts or grants from the United States
 government, local or regional governments, private sources, or
 other sources; and
 (4) interest earned on money credited to the fund.
 (b) The fund [account] shall be administered by the board in
 accordance with this section.
 (c) The board may use the fund [account] to fund the
 performance of the board's functions under Section 16.316.
 (d) The board may invest, reinvest, and direct the
 investment of any available money in the fund [account] as provided
 by law for the investment of money under Section 404.024,
 Government Code.
 (e)  Section 403.095, Government Code, does not apply to the
 fund.
 SECTION 2. Section 251.004(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b) Each state fiscal year, the comptroller shall
 reallocate to the floodplain management fund [account] established
 under Section 16.3161, Water Code, the first $3.05 million of the
 maintenance taxes collected under Chapter 252 and deposited in the
 general revenue fund.
 SECTION 3. The floodplain management account established
 under Section 16.3161, Water Code, is redesignated as the
 floodplain management fund and re-created by this Act as a special
 fund in the state treasury outside the general revenue fund, and the
 revenue required by Section 251.004, Insurance Code, and Section
 16.3161, Water Code, to be reallocated to or deposited in the fund,
 as applicable, is required by this Act to be reallocated to or
 deposited in the fund for the purposes specified by Section
 16.3161.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *