Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2558 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 2558
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on
 Flooding and Evacuations; May 18, 2009, reported favorably from
 Committee on Intergovernmental Relations by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to registration for evacuation and disaster preparedness
 for clients of home and community support services agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 142, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 142.0201 to read as follows:
 Sec. 142.0201.  REGISTRATION FOR EVACUATION; DISASTER
 PREPAREDNESS. A home and community support services agency shall:
 (1)  assist clients as necessary with registering for
 disaster evacuation assistance through 2-1-1 services provided by
 the Texas Information and Referral Network; and
 (2)  counsel clients as necessary regarding disaster
 preparedness.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *