Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2647 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kent, Miklos (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2647
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2647 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the quasi-judicial enforcement of certain health and
 safety ordinances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.018(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) In an action under this section, the municipality may
 also bring:
 (1) a claim for civil penalties under Section 54.017;
 and
 (2)  an action in rem against the structure that may
 result in a judgment against the structure as well as a judgment
 against the defendant.
 SECTION 2. Section 54.040(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) An order issued under Section 54.036, including any
 civil penalties assessed under Section 54.036(5), is enforceable in
 the same manner as provided in Sections 214.001(k), (m), (n), and
 (o). An abstract of judgment shall be ordered [issued] against all
 parties found to be the owners of the subject property or in
 possession of that property.
 SECTION 3. Sections 214.003(a), (b), (c), and (i), Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) A home-rule municipality may bring an action in district
 court against an owner of property that is not in substantial
 compliance with:
 (1) the municipal ordinances regarding:
 (A) [(1)] fire protection;
 (B) [(2)] structural integrity;
 (C) [(3)] zoning; or
 (D) [(4)] disposal of refuse; or
 (2)  a municipal ordinance described by Section
 54.012(1), (2), (5), (6), (7), or (9).
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), the court may
 appoint as a receiver for the property a nonprofit organization or
 an individual with a demonstrated record of rehabilitating
 properties if the court finds that:
 (1) the structures on the property are in violation of
 the standards set forth in Section 214.001(b) and an ordinance
 described by Subsection (a);
 (2) notice of violation was given to the record owner
 of the property; and
 (3) a public hearing as required by Section 214.001(d)
 has been conducted.
 (c) A receiver appointed under Subsection (b) may act [The
 court may appoint] as a receiver for any property, including
 historic property subject to Section 214.00111 [a nonprofit
 organization or an individual with a demonstrated record of
 rehabilitating historical buildings if the court finds that:
 [(1)     the structures on the property are in violation
 of the standards established under Section 214.001(b) and an
 ordinance described by Subsection (a);
 [(2)     the structure has been reviewed by the municipal
 historic preservation board and the structure meets the criteria
 set forth in Section 214.00111;
 [(3)     notice of the violation was given to the record
 owner of the property; and
 [(4)     a public hearing as required by Section 214.001
 has been conducted].
 (i) Any record lienholder may, after initiation of an action
 by a municipality:
 (1) intervene in the action; and
 (2) request appointment as a receiver:
 (A) under the same conditions as the nonprofit
 organization or individual; and
 (B) on a demonstration to the court of an ability
 and willingness to rehabilitate the property.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *