Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2664 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ritter (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2664
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2009;
 May 12, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a defense to prosecution for the offense of
 unlawful carrying of a handgun by a license holder on the premises
 of certain businesses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 46.035, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  It is a defense to prosecution under Subsection (b)(1)
 that the actor was not given effective notice under Section
 411.204, Government Code.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *