Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2692 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2692
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain municipal requirements regarding sales of
 residential properties in certain areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 214.905(d), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d) This section does not apply to:
 (1) property that is part of an urban land bank
 program; or
 (2)  a multifamily residential development of eight or
 more residential units:
 (A) intended for private sale;
 (B)  located less than one mile from a commuter
 rail station; and
 (C) located in a municipality:
 (i) with a population of more than 650,000;
 (ii)  that has a governing body consisting
 only of members who are elected at large; and
 (iii)  in which a commuter rail system was
 approved by an election held after November 1, 2004.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *