Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2703 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Olivo (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 2703
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to classification of a prekindergarten or kindergarten
 student who is retained at the request of the student's parent.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 29.081, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d)(1), a student is not
 considered a student at risk of dropping out of school if the
 student did not advance from prekindergarten or kindergarten to the
 next grade level only as the result of the request of the student's
 parent.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *