Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2729 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 6, 2009      TO: Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2729 by Pitts (Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.), As Engrossed   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2729, As Engrossed: a negative impact of ($6,721,786) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 6, 2009





  TO: Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2729 by Pitts (Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2729 by Pitts (Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance 

 Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2729 by Pitts (Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.), As Engrossed

HB2729 by Pitts (Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.), As Engrossed

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2729, As Engrossed: a negative impact of ($6,721,786) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2729, As Engrossed: a negative impact of ($6,721,786) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

 Appropriations:  Fiscal Year Appropriation out ofGeneral Revenue Fund1  Appropriation out ofState Highway Fund6  Appropriation out ofSolid Waste Disposal Acct5000    2010 $6,721,786 $5,637,820 $336,537   2011 $0 $0 $0   General Revenue-Related Funds, Two-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($6,721,786)   2011 $0    General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($6,721,786)   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0     All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromSolid Waste Disposal Acct5000  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromState Highway Fund6    2010 ($6,721,786) ($336,537) ($5,637,820)   2011 $0 $0 $0   2012 $0 $0 $0   2013 $0 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0 $0   Fiscal Analysis The bill would make appropriations from the General Revenue Fund, State Highway Fund and the GR Account Solid Waste Disposal Fees No. 5000 to pay itemized claims and judgements plus interest, if any, against the state. Methodology Under the provisions of the bill, before any claim or judgement may be paid from money appropriated the claim or judgement must be verified and substantiated by the administrator of the fund or account, and then approved by the Attorney General and the Comptroller of Public Accounts before August 31, 2010.   The cost to the General Revenue Fund 0001, GR Account 5000, and the State Highway Fund 0006 would be the increased appropriation authority in fiscal 2010 to pay the specific claims and judgements that would be settled by this bill.   The bill would take effect September 1, 2009. 

  Fiscal Year Appropriation out ofGeneral Revenue Fund1  Appropriation out ofState Highway Fund6  Appropriation out ofSolid Waste Disposal Acct5000    2010 $6,721,786 $5,637,820 $336,537   2011 $0 $0 $0  


2010 $6,721,786 $5,637,820 $336,537
2011 $0 $0 $0

General Revenue-Related Funds, Two-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($6,721,786)   2011 $0    


2010 ($6,721,786)
2011 $0

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($6,721,786)   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 ($6,721,786)
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromSolid Waste Disposal Acct5000  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromState Highway Fund6    2010 ($6,721,786) ($336,537) ($5,637,820)   2011 $0 $0 $0   2012 $0 $0 $0   2013 $0 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromSolid Waste Disposal Acct5000  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromState Highway Fund6    2010 ($6,721,786) ($336,537) ($5,637,820)   2011 $0 $0 $0   2012 $0 $0 $0   2013 $0 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0 $0  


2010 ($6,721,786) ($336,537) ($5,637,820)
2011 $0 $0 $0
2012 $0 $0 $0
2013 $0 $0 $0
2014 $0 $0 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would make appropriations from the General Revenue Fund, State Highway Fund and the GR Account Solid Waste Disposal Fees No. 5000 to pay itemized claims and judgements plus interest, if any, against the state.

The bill would make appropriations from the General Revenue Fund, State Highway Fund and the GR

Account Solid Waste Disposal Fees No. 5000 to pay itemized claims and judgements plus interest, if

any, against the state.

Methodology

Under the provisions of the bill, before any claim or judgement may be paid from money appropriated the claim or judgement must be verified and substantiated by the administrator of the fund or account, and then approved by the Attorney General and the Comptroller of Public Accounts before August 31, 2010.   The cost to the General Revenue Fund 0001, GR Account 5000, and the State Highway Fund 0006 would be the increased appropriation authority in fiscal 2010 to pay the specific claims and judgements that would be settled by this bill.   The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

Under the provisions of the bill, before any claim or judgement may be paid from money appropriated

the claim or judgement must be verified and substantiated by the administrator of the fund or

account, and then approved by the Attorney General and the Comptroller of Public Accounts before

August 31, 2010.

 

The cost to the General Revenue Fund 0001, GR Account 5000, and the State Highway Fund 0006

would be the increased appropriation authority in fiscal 2010 to pay the specific claims and

judgements that would be settled by this bill.

 

The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: JOB, MN, SD

 JOB, MN, SD