Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2743 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R10523 EAH-F
 By: Paxton H.B. No. 2743


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of certain county financial
 information on certain counties' Internet websites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 112, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 112.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 112.011.  ELECTRONIC CHECKING ACCOUNT TRANSACTION
 REGISTER. (a)  This section applies only to a county with a
 population of 50,000 or more.
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county shall maintain the
 transaction register for the county's checking account in a
 searchable electronic spreadsheet format, such as a portable
 document format (PDF) or similar file type, in which the
 transaction register is readily available for purposes of
 Subsections (d) and (e). Except as provided by Subsection (c), the
 electronic checking account transaction register must include for
 each check written from a county checking account:
 (1) the transaction amount;
 (2) the name of the payee; and
 (3)  a statement of the purpose of the expenditure for
 which the check was written.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), beginning September
 1, 2009, a county's electronic checking account transaction
 register must contain the information required by Subsections
 (b)(1) and (2) for each check dated on or after August 1, 2009.
 Beginning September 1, 2010, a county's electronic checking account
 transaction register must contain the information required by
 Subsections (b)(1) through (3) for each check dated on or after
 August 1, 2010.  This subsection expires October 1, 2010.
 (c)  A county may not include in the county's electronic
 checking account transaction register a check issued to a county
 employee in payment of:
 (1) salary, wages, or an employment stipend; or
 (2)  a workers' compensation income benefit, medical
 benefit, death benefit, or burial benefit that is issued by a county
 operating as a self-insurer under Chapter 504, Labor Code.
 (d)  A county shall prominently post the electronic checking
 account transaction register at all times on the county's Internet
 website for viewing and downloading by interested persons.
 (e)  A county shall share data from the electronic checking
 account transaction register with any interested person who
 requests the data.
 (f) A county shall:
 (1)  update the electronic checking account
 transaction register at least once each month, not later than the
 30th day after the closing date of the most recent monthly statement
 for the checking account; and
 (2)  maintain each transaction or listing in the
 electronic checking account transaction register on the county's
 Internet website until the second anniversary of the date of the
 transaction or listing.
 (g)  The commissioners court of a county may consult with the
 comptroller in developing an electronic checking account
 transaction register under this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.