Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2754 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 23, 2009      TO: Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2754 by Castro (Relating to a central database containing information about certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2754, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 23, 2009





  TO: Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2754 by Castro (Relating to a central database containing information about certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2754 by Castro (Relating to a central database containing information about certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.), As Introduced

 Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety 

 Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2754 by Castro (Relating to a central database containing information about certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.), As Introduced

HB2754 by Castro (Relating to a central database containing information about certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2754, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2754, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $0   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 $0
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromState Highway Fund6    2010 ($275,275)   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromState Highway Fund6    2010 ($275,275)   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0  


2010 ($275,275)
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code relating to a central database containing informationabout certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.  The billwould add Government Code, Section 411.1355, Central Database of Offenders Who HaveCommitted Offenses Involving Family Violence, which states that the Department of Public Safety(DPS) shall maintain a computerized database containing information on persons who have beenconvicted three or more times for an offense involving family violence.  The database is designated aspublic information except for the person's social security number, driver license number, andtelephone number or any information that would identify the victim of the offense.  The database mustcontain, to the extent the information is available to DPS, the person's (offender's) full name, aliases,date of birth, last known address, physical description, a recent photograph, a list of offenses for which the person was convicted, and the custodial disposition of the person.  The bill also states process and procedures to petition and allow removal of a person's name from the database.  The bill states the database is required to be implemented no later than January 1, 2010 and may include information only on persons convicted of at least one offense committed on or after the effective date of this act.   The bill would take effect immediately if two-thirds of the House of Representatives and Senate members vote to enact the legislation.  If it does not receive the vote necessary for immediate impact, the bill would take effect on September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Government Code relating to a central database containing informationabout certain offenders who have committed offenses involving family or dating violence.  The billwould add Government Code, Section 411.1355, Central Database of Offenders Who HaveCommitted Offenses Involving Family Violence, which states that the Department of Public Safety(DPS) shall maintain a computerized database containing information on persons who have beenconvicted three or more times for an offense involving family violence.  The database is designated aspublic information except for the person's social security number, driver license number, andtelephone number or any information that would identify the victim of the offense.  The database mustcontain, to the extent the information is available to DPS, the person's (offender's) full name, aliases,date of birth, last known address, physical description, a recent photograph, a list of offenses for which the person was convicted, and the custodial disposition of the person.  The bill also states process and procedures to petition and allow removal of a person's name from the database.  The bill states the database is required to be implemented no later than January 1, 2010 and may include information only on persons convicted of at least one offense committed on or after the effective date of this act.  

The bill would take effect immediately if two-thirds of the House of Representatives and Senate members vote to enact the legislation.  If it does not receive the vote necessary for immediate impact, the bill would take effect on September 1, 2009.

Methodology

The technology costs estimated to comply with the development of a central database containing information about offenses involving family or dating violence includes a one-time cost of $275,275 (1,925 hours x $143 per hour) in State Highway Funds in fiscal year 2010 for computer program changes to allow DPS to filter records where family violence was reported by the court clerks on aconviction. 

The technology costs estimated to comply with the development of a central database containing

information about offenses involving family or dating violence includes a one-time cost of $275,275

(1,925 hours x $143 per hour) in State Highway Funds in fiscal year 2010 for computer program

changes to allow DPS to filter records where family violence was reported by the court clerks on a

Technology

 The technology costs estimated to comply with the development of a central database containing information about offenses involving family or dating violence includes a one-time cost of $275,275for computer programming changes.

The technology costs estimated to comply with the development of a central database containing

information about offenses involving family or dating violence includes a one-time cost of $275,275for computer programming changes.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety

405 Department of Public Safety

LBB Staff: JOB, ESi, GG, LG, MWU

 JOB, ESi, GG, LG, MWU