Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2763 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2763
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 11, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 11, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2763 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of industrialized housing and buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1202.002(c), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) Industrialized housing does not include:
 (1) a residential structure that exceeds three stories
 or 49 feet in height [as measured from the finished grade elevation
 at the building entrance to the peak of the roof];
 (2) housing constructed of a sectional or panelized
 system that does not use a modular component; or
 (3) a ready-built home constructed in a manner in
 which the entire living area is contained in a single unit or
 section at a temporary location for the purpose of selling and
 moving the home to another location.
 SECTION 2. Section 1202.003(d), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d) An industrialized building includes a permanent
 commercial structure and a commercial structure designed to be
 transported from one commercial site to another commercial site but
 does not include:
 (1) a commercial structure that exceeds three stories
 or 49 feet in height [as measured from the finished grade elevation
 at the building entrance to the peak of the roof]; or
 (2) a commercial building or structure that is:
 (A) installed in a manner other than on a
 permanent foundation; and
 (B) either:
 (i) not open to the public; or
 (ii) less than 1,500 square feet in total
 area and used other than as a school or a place of religious
 worship.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 1202, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1202.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1202.004.  RELOCATABLE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. (a) In
 this section, "relocatable educational facility" means a portable,
 modular building capable of being relocated, regardless of whether
 the facility is built at the installation site, that is used
 primarily as an educational facility for teaching the curriculum
 required under Section 28.002, Education Code.
 (b)  A relocatable educational facility that is purchased or
 leased on or after January 1, 2010, must comply with all provisions
 applicable to industrialized buildings under this chapter.
 SECTION 4. Section 1202.1535(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) The owner of an industrialized building designed to be
 transported from one commercial site to another that bears an
 approved decal or insignia indicating the building complies with
 the mandatory building codes and that is modified or altered after
 the date the council adopts a new mandatory building code or the
 council approves a building code amendment must ensure that the
 modified or altered building complies with the requirements and
 standards of the new building code or amendment to the extent
 required by the most recent edition of the International Existing
 Building Code adopted by the council [:
 [(1)     the entire building complies with the mandatory
 building code or building code amendment if the cost of the
 modification or alteration to the building is at least 50 percent of
 the value of the modules or modular components used in the
 construction of the building; or
 [(2)     the modified or altered portion of the building
 complies with the mandatory building code or building code
 amendment if the cost of the modification or alteration is less than
 50 percent of the value of the modules or modular components].
 SECTION 5. Section 46.008(b), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Section 5 of this Act takes effect December 31, 2009.
 * * * * *