Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2799 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Driver (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2799
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the responsibilities of a person who qualifies for a
 peace officer license but has not yet been appointed as a peace
 officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.3075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.3075.  QUALIFIED APPLICANT AWAITING APPOINTMENT.
 (a)  A person who meets the requirements set forth in Section
 1701.307(a) has the same reporting responsibilities toward the
 commission under rules adopted by the commission as a license
 holder who has already been appointed as a peace officer.
 (b)  The commission may determine that a person who meets the
 requirements under Section 1701.307(a) is ineligible for
 appointment as a peace officer based on events that occur after the
 person meets the requirements in Section 1701.307(a) but before the
 person is appointed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *