Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB280 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R1710 TRH-D
 By: Anchia H.B. No. 280


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to electric utility energy efficiency goals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a) It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1) electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2) all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3) each electric utility will provide, through
 market-based standard offer programs or limited, targeted,
 market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient for retail
 electric providers and competitive energy service providers to
 acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for
 residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least:
 (A) 30 [10] percent of the electric utility's
 annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2011 [2007];
 (B) 40 [15] percent of the electric utility's
 annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2013 [2008, provided that the electric utility's
 program expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75
 percent above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential
 and commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006,
 filing]; and
 (C) 50 [20] percent of the electric utility's
 annual growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2015 [2009, provided that the electric utility's
 program expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150
 percent above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential
 and commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006,
 filing];
 (4) each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section;
 (5) retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; and
 (6) notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007.
 (a-1)  It is the goal of the legislature that, beginning with
 the year ending December 31, 2016, each electric utility will
 provide incentives sufficient for retail electric providers and
 competitive energy service providers to acquire additional
 cost-effective energy efficiency for all customers, in all
 categories, to the extent that the total annual energy consumption
 in this state is reduced by two percent each year.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.