Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2813 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2813
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the salary of a Starr County Juvenile Board member.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 152.2201(c), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) The commissioners court may pay the juvenile board
 members an annual salary set by the commissioners court at not less
 than $1,200 or more than $10,000 [$3,600] for the added duties
 imposed on the members. The salary shall be paid in equal monthly
 installments from the general fund of the county.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *