Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB284 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 3, 2009      TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on Environmental Regulation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB284 by Anchia (Relating to reporting of international shipments of electronic waste.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB284, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($431,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 3, 2009





  TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on Environmental Regulation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB284 by Anchia (Relating to reporting of international shipments of electronic waste.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on Environmental Regulation
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB284 by Anchia (Relating to reporting of international shipments of electronic waste.), As Introduced

 Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on Environmental Regulation 

 Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on Environmental Regulation 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB284 by Anchia (Relating to reporting of international shipments of electronic waste.), As Introduced

HB284 by Anchia (Relating to reporting of international shipments of electronic waste.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB284, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($431,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB284, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($431,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($229,000)   2011 ($202,000)   2012 ($52,000)   2013 ($51,000)   2014 ($50,000)    


2010 ($229,000)
2011 ($202,000)
2012 ($52,000)
2013 ($51,000)
2014 ($50,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($229,000)   2011 ($202,000)   2012 ($52,000)   2013 ($51,000)   2014 ($50,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($229,000)   2011 ($202,000)   2012 ($52,000)   2013 ($51,000)   2014 ($50,000)  


2010 ($229,000)
2011 ($202,000)
2012 ($52,000)
2013 ($51,000)
2014 ($50,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require businesses in the state of Texas that ship any sort of electronic equipment outside the United States for recycling, reuse, or disposal to report quarterly to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ). The TCEQ would be required to make the report available to the public through its website. The bill also specifies information in the report. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009, and the first reporting period would be required for the September 1 through December 31, 2009 time period and be due by January 15, 2010.

Methodology

The TCEQ would be required to develop a system to report the volume type, and destination of electronic waste being exported outside the United States from Texas each quarter. This would require the development of a database. This estimate assumes that the database would be developed with assistance of the Department of Information Resources at a cost of $300,000, with the cost spread over fiscal years 2010 and 2011. In addition, the TCEQ's data service center contract would be increased to accomodate the additional project, along with annual maintenance costs. This estimate assumes that the cost would come from the General Revenue Fund, since the bill does not specify a funding source or authorize fees to cover costs.  

Technology

The TCEQ's data service center contract and related capital budget project would have to be increased  to accomodate the new database project required by the bill. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 582 Commission on Environmental Quality

582 Commission on Environmental Quality

LBB Staff: JOB, WK, ZS, TL

 JOB, WK, ZS, TL