Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2845 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 19, 2009      TO: Honorable Yvonne Davis, Chair, House Committee on Urban Affairs      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2845 by Riddle (Relating to the certification of and disciplinary actions against emergency medical services personnel.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2845, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 19, 2009





  TO: Honorable Yvonne Davis, Chair, House Committee on Urban Affairs      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2845 by Riddle (Relating to the certification of and disciplinary actions against emergency medical services personnel.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Yvonne Davis, Chair, House Committee on Urban Affairs
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2845 by Riddle (Relating to the certification of and disciplinary actions against emergency medical services personnel.), As Introduced

 Honorable Yvonne Davis, Chair, House Committee on Urban Affairs 

 Honorable Yvonne Davis, Chair, House Committee on Urban Affairs 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2845 by Riddle (Relating to the certification of and disciplinary actions against emergency medical services personnel.), As Introduced

HB2845 by Riddle (Relating to the certification of and disciplinary actions against emergency medical services personnel.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2845, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2845, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $0   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 $0
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 $13,568 ($13,568) 0.2   2011 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   2012 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   2013 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   2014 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 $13,568 ($13,568) 0.2   2011 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   2012 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   2013 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3   2014 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3  


2010 $13,568 ($13,568) 0.2
2011 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3
2012 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3
2013 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3
2014 $20,250 ($20,250) 0.3

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code, to authorize the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to provide, upon request, a prescreening criminal history check for an emergency medical services personnel applicant prior to the applicant's completion of the educational and training requirements for certification. DSHS would be authorized to charge the applicant a reasonable fee for the costs associated with the requested prescreening. The bill would also remove the applicability of Chapter 53, Occupations Code, to individuals applying for emergency medical services personnel certification. The bill would instead provide authority in Chapter 773 for DSHS to revoke, suspend, disqualify for, or deny certification of emergency medical services personnel for certain criminal offenses.  The bill would take effect September 1, 2009; however, the authorization to provide prescreenings would apply only to an application submitted on or after January 1, 2010.

The bill would amend Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code, to authorize the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to provide, upon request, a prescreening criminal history check for an emergency medical services personnel applicant prior to the applicant's completion of the educational and training requirements for certification. DSHS would be authorized to charge the applicant a reasonable fee for the costs associated with the requested prescreening. The bill would also remove the applicability of Chapter 53, Occupations Code, to individuals applying for emergency medical services personnel certification. The bill would instead provide authority in Chapter 773 for DSHS to revoke, suspend, disqualify for, or deny certification of emergency medical services personnel for certain criminal offenses. 

The bill would take effect September 1, 2009; however, the authorization to provide prescreenings would apply only to an application submitted on or after January 1, 2010.

Methodology

DSHS indicates that 4,500 emergency medical services personnel are certified each year and estimates that 15 percent would request a prescreening (675 applicants per year). Calculations assume a $30 fee paid by each applicant who requests a criminal history prescreening. The bill would result in a total increase in revenue of $13,568 in fiscal year 2010 and $20,250 for each fiscal year thereafter from the prescreening fee paid by the applicant. DSHS would reimburse the Department of Public Safety for the $1 name check fee for each applicant. DSHS would require 0.2 FTEs for fiscal year 2010 and 0.3 FTEs for each fiscal year thereafter. FTE costs would total $13,568 in General Revenue Funds for fiscal year 2010 and $20,250 for each fiscal year thereafter.

DSHS indicates that 4,500 emergency medical services personnel are certified each year and estimates that 15 percent would request a prescreening (675 applicants per year). Calculations assume a $30 fee paid by each applicant who requests a criminal history prescreening. The bill would result in a total increase in revenue of $13,568 in fiscal year 2010 and $20,250 for each fiscal year thereafter from the prescreening fee paid by the applicant. DSHS would reimburse the Department of Public Safety for the $1 name check fee for each applicant.

DSHS would require 0.2 FTEs for fiscal year 2010 and 0.3 FTEs for each fiscal year thereafter. FTE costs would total $13,568 in General Revenue Funds for fiscal year 2010 and $20,250 for each fiscal year thereafter.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety, 537 State Health Services, Department of

405 Department of Public Safety, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, DB, VJC, MB

 JOB, DB, VJC, MB