Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2854 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 2, 2009      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2854 by Hughes (Relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of Transportation for professional firefighters.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2854, As Introduced: a positive impact of $19,717 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011, if the effective date of the bill is July 1, 2009; or a positive impact of $18,200 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011, if the effective date of the bill is September 1, 2009. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 2, 2009





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2854 by Hughes (Relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of Transportation for professional firefighters.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2854 by Hughes (Relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of Transportation for professional firefighters.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2854 by Hughes (Relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of Transportation for professional firefighters.), As Introduced

HB2854 by Hughes (Relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of Transportation for professional firefighters.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2854, As Introduced: a positive impact of $19,717 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011, if the effective date of the bill is July 1, 2009; or a positive impact of $18,200 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011, if the effective date of the bill is September 1, 2009. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2854, As Introduced: a positive impact of $19,717 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011, if the effective date of the bill is July 1, 2009; or a positive impact of $18,200 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011, if the effective date of the bill is September 1, 2009.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Six-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2009 $1,517   2010 $9,100   2011 $9,100   2012 $9,100   2013 $9,100   2014 $9,100    


2009 $1,517
2010 $9,100
2011 $9,100
2012 $9,100
2013 $9,100
2014 $9,100

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $9,100   2011 $9,100   2012 $9,100   2013 $9,100   2014 $9,100    


2010 $9,100
2011 $9,100
2012 $9,100
2013 $9,100
2014 $9,100

 All Funds, Six-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2009 ($1,517) $1,517   2010 ($9,100) $9,100   2011 ($9,100) $9,100   2012 ($9,100) $9,100   2013 ($9,100) $9,100   2014 ($9,100) $9,100   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2009 ($1,517) $1,517   2010 ($9,100) $9,100   2011 ($9,100) $9,100   2012 ($9,100) $9,100   2013 ($9,100) $9,100   2014 ($9,100) $9,100  


2009 ($1,517) $1,517
2010 ($9,100) $9,100
2011 ($9,100) $9,100
2012 ($9,100) $9,100
2013 ($9,100) $9,100
2014 ($9,100) $9,100

   Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($9,100) $9,100   2011 ($9,100) $9,100   2012 ($9,100) $9,100   2013 ($9,100) $9,100   2014 ($9,100) $9,100   Fiscal Analysis The bill would require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to allow the sponsor of a specialty license plate for professional firefighters to nominate a state agency for receipt of funds at any time after the license plate is created.  The bill would require funds received by a state agency from these specialty license plates to be used in making grants to support activities of a professional firefighters organization that meets the requirements specified by the bill.   The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house or otherwise on September 1, 2009. Methodology TxDOT indicates that fees from the Professional Firefighters specialty license plates are currently deposited to the State Highway Fund. Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT and the Comptroller's office, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would result in the transfer of $9,100 from the State Highway Fund to the General Revenue Fund. If the bill receives the requisite vote to take immediate effect, it is assumed the transfer of the specialty plate revenues would begin on July 1, 2009 (fiscal year 2009). Otherwise, the transfer of fee revenues would begin in fiscal year 2010. 

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($9,100) $9,100   2011 ($9,100) $9,100   2012 ($9,100) $9,100   2013 ($9,100) $9,100   2014 ($9,100) $9,100  


2010 ($9,100) $9,100
2011 ($9,100) $9,100
2012 ($9,100) $9,100
2013 ($9,100) $9,100
2014 ($9,100) $9,100

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to allow the sponsor of a specialty license plate for professional firefighters to nominate a state agency for receipt of funds at any time after the license plate is created.  The bill would require funds received by a state agency from these specialty license plates to be used in making grants to support activities of a professional firefighters organization that meets the requirements specified by the bill.   The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house or otherwise on September 1, 2009.

The bill would require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to allow the sponsor of a specialty license plate for professional firefighters to nominate a state agency for receipt of funds at any time after the license plate is created.  The bill would require funds received by a state agency from these specialty license plates to be used in making grants to support activities of a professional firefighters organization that meets the requirements specified by the bill.

 

The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house or otherwise on September 1, 2009.

Methodology

TxDOT indicates that fees from the Professional Firefighters specialty license plates are currently deposited to the State Highway Fund. Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT and the Comptroller's office, it is assumed the provisions of the bill would result in the transfer of $9,100 from the State Highway Fund to the General Revenue Fund. If the bill receives the requisite vote to take immediate effect, it is assumed the transfer of the specialty plate revenues would begin on July 1, 2009 (fiscal year 2009). Otherwise, the transfer of fee revenues would begin in fiscal year 2010.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 601 Department of Transportation

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, KJG, MW, TG

 JOB, KJG, MW, TG