Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2876 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2876
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of an administrative law judge to order
 the release of certain information relating to a child abuse and
 neglect investigation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 261.201, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  On a motion of one of the parties in a contested case
 before an administrative law judge relating to the license or
 certification of a professional, as defined by Section 261.101(b),
 or an educator, as defined by Section 5.001, Education Code, the
 administrative law judge may order the disclosure of information
 that is confidential under this section that relates to the matter
 before the administrative law judge after a hearing for which
 notice is provided as required by Subsection (b)(2) and making the
 review and determination required by Subsection (b)(3).  Before the
 department may release information under this subsection, the
 department must edit the information to protect the confidentiality
 of the identity of any person who makes a report of abuse or
 neglect.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *